Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián López Martín

Bishop Emeritus of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1945 Born
30 Jun 196823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Spain
15 Jul 199449.2AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
25 Sep 199449.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
19 Mar 200256.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
28 Apr 200257.0InstalledBishop of León, Spain
21 Oct 202075.5RetiredBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián López Martín (VIAF: 7545923)
Bishop Julián López Martín (born ) Bishop Emeritus of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciudad Rodrigo, Diocese of Ciudad Rodrigo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of León.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,439
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast