Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Fernández González

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1955 Born
29 Jun 198024.7Ordained PriestPriest of León, Spain
10 Dec 201358.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
10 Dec 201358.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
8 Feb 201458.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotdon
8 Jun 202064.7AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
18 Jul 202064.8InstalledBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Fernández González
Bishop Jesús Fernández González (born ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelga de Ordán, Diocese of León
Ordained BishopCathedral, Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Astorga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 13 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 7 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,096
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2020
  • i: CB, 12 Jun 2020
  • i: CB, 25 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast