Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Clarete Cinches, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Surigao, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1932Born
22 Oct 196129.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
10 Jan 197340.9AppointedBishop of Surigao, Philippines
24 Mar 197341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Surigao, Philippines
21 Apr 200169.2ResignedBishop of Surigao, Philippines
12 Apr 201078.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Surigao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Miguel Clarete Cinches
Bishop Miguel Clarete Cinches S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Surigao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDauis
Ordained BishopQuezon City

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,162
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast