Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Gerard Lennon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1947Born
19 May 197326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
29 Jun 200154.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
29 Jun 200154.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
14 Sep 200154.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufes
13 Dec 200255.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
1 Jul 200356.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
4 Apr 200659.0AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
15 May 200659.1InstalledBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
28 Dec 201669.7ResignedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
29 Oct 201972.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Gerard Lennon
Bishop Richard Gerard Lennon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArlington, MA
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Death PlaceBrecksville, OH, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Buried Place (Original)Resurrection Chapel, St. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Cleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,046
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 29 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast