Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
15 Aug 1958 | Born | ||
26 Oct 1985 | 27.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Eldoret, Kenya |
27 Mar 2024 | 65.6 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Eldoret, Kenya |
27 Mar 2024 | 65.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Mons in Numidia |
(WikiData: Q125169543)
Father
John Kiplimo
Lelei
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of Eldoret
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Soy, Prefecture Apostolic of Eldoret |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Eldoret.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 14 Apr 2024 |
✠