Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Khamphan

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Paksé, Laos

Titular Bishop of Semina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1925Born
19 Oct 195530.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paksé, Laos
10 Jul 197549.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Paksé, Laos
10 Jul 197549.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Semina
10 Aug 197549.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semina
30 Oct 200075.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Paksé, Laos
26 Jul 200175.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Paksé, Laos

MicroData Summary for Thomas Khamphan
Bishop Thomas Khamphan (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Paksé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKhampeng
Ordained BishopPaksé, Vicariate Apostolic of Paksé

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,988

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast