Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Nantha

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos

Titular Bishop of Succuba

Apostolic Administrator of Luang Prabang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1909Born
27 Jun 193525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vientiane, Laos
25 Apr 197464.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vientiane, Laos
25 Apr 197464.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Succuba
30 Jun 197464.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Succuba
22 May 197565.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos
29 Nov 197566.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Luang Prabang, Laos
7 Apr 198474.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos

MicroData Summary for Thomas Nantha
Bishop Thomas Nantha (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Vientiane

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaksane
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast