Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Clement Kelley

Deceased

Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1870Born
24 Aug 189322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Jun 192453.6AppointedBishop of Oklahoma, USA
2 Oct 192453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oklahoma, USA
1 Feb 194877.2DiedBishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Clement Kelley (VIAF: 8661729)
Bishop Francis Clement Kelley (born , died ) Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVernon River, Canada
Ordained PriestSeminary and College of Nicolet, Chapel, Nicolet, Diocese of Nicolet, Québec, Canada

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast