Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dariusz Piotr Kałuża, M.S.F.

Bishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1967 Born
8 Sep 198719.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
8 May 199325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
9 Jun 201648.5AppointedBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
20 Aug 201648.7Ordained BishopBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
12 Sep 202052.8AppointedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
15 Nov 202053.0InstalledBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Dariusz Piotr Kałuża
Bishop Dariusz Piotr Kałuża M.S.F. (born ) Bishop of Bougainville

EventPlace
Birth PlacePszczyna
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Mary Help of Christians, Church, Kefamo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bougainville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 24 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 20 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,077
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2020
  • i: AM, 5 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast