Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop László Kádár, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1927Born
5 Sep 194619.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
16 Jun 195022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
8 Feb 197244.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
8 Feb 197244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Saetabis
16 Mar 197244.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saetabis
7 Jan 197547.3AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
2 Mar 197850.5AppointedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
20 Dec 198659.2DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Kádár
Archbishop László Kádár O. Cist. (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEger
Ordained BishopSzent István, Cathedral, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 15 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 992

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast