Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Jenik

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Druas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1944 Born
30 May 197026.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
14 Jun 201470.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
14 Jun 201470.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Druas
4 Aug 201470.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druas
10 Oct 201975.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Jenik
Bishop John Joseph Jenik (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManhattan
Ordained PriestSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2014
  • ob/c12: CB, 14 Jun 2014
  • c34: CB, 17 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,259
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast