Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Yariyok Jatau

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kaduna, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1931Born
7 Jul 196331.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 197240.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kaduna, Nigeria
26 Jun 197240.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Velebusdus
5 Nov 197241.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Velebusdus
10 Apr 197543.6AppointedArchbishop of Kaduna, Nigeria
16 Nov 200776.2RetiredArchbishop of Kaduna, Nigeria
16 Dec 2020³89.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kaduna, Nigeria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Yariyok Jatau
Archbishop Peter Yariyok Jatau (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kaduna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarsa Kaje
Ordained BishopAhamaou Belle stadium, Kaduna, Archdiocese of Kaduna
Death PlaceSt. Gerard's Catholic, Hospital, Kaduna, Archdiocese of Kaduna

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 984
  • d: CB, 16 Dec 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast