Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Igwemezie Uzoukwu

Bishop of Minna, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1950 Born
14 Dec 198030.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ilorin, Nigeria
27 Sep 198131.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ilorin, Nigeria
5 Jul 199645.8AppointedBishop of Minna, Nigeria
30 Nov 199646.2Ordained BishopBishop of Minna, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Martin Igwemezie Uzoukwu
Bishop Martin Igwemezie Uzoukwu (born ) Bishop of Minna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOzubulu
Ordained DeaconHoly Trinity, Cathedral, Onitsha, Archdiocese of Onitsha
Ordained BishopSaint Michael, Cathedral, Minna, Diocese of Minna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Minna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,867
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast