Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul Maurice Jaeger

Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1944 Born
6 Apr 197429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Nancy (-Toul), France
11 Apr 199146.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
2 Jun 199146.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
30 Nov 199147.2SucceededBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
12 Aug 199853.9AppointedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
4 Sep 202075.9RetiredBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Maurice Jaeger
Bishop Jean-Paul Maurice Jaeger (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNancy, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nancy, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd: CB, 10 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,451
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Aug 2021

Quantcast