Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hervé Itoua

Bishop Emeritus of Ouesso, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1942 Born
12 Jul 197028.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 198341.4AppointedBishop of Ouesso, Congo
28 Aug 198341.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ouesso, Congo
22 Apr 200664.3ResignedBishop of Ouesso, Congo

MicroData Summary for Hervé Itoua
Bishop Hervé Itoua (born 1942) Bishop Emeritus of Ouesso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOtambioko

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ouesso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast