Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Dios Hernández Ruiz, S.J.

Bishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1948 Born
197425.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
26 Dec 197628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Dec 200557.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
3 Dec 200557.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cures Sabinorum
14 Jan 200657.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cures Sabinorum
5 Jun 201970.5AppointedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
13 Jul 201970.6InstalledBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Juan de Dios Hernández Ruiz
Bishop Juan de Dios Hernández Ruiz S.J. (born ) Bishop of Pinar del Rio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHolguín
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Habana, Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinar del Rio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,038
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2019
  • i: CB, 24 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast