Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Jehová Heras Segarra, O.F.M.

Bishop of Loja, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1964 Born
22 Sep 199026.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Aug 199228.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Mar 200944.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador
25 Mar 200944.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari
21 May 200945.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari
2 May 201955.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Loja, Ecuador
31 Oct 201955.5AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
14 Dec 201955.6InstalledBishop of Loja, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Walter Jehová Heras Segarra (VIAF: 203270918)
Bishop Walter Jehová Heras Segarra O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Loja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBulán, Archdiocese of Cuenca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zamora, Vicariate Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Loja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,175
  • ab: CB, 2 May 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2019
  • i: AM, 21 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Jan 2021

Quantcast