Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John William Heffernan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya

Titular Bishop of Uzippari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1883Born
28 Oct 191229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Mar 193248.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zanzibar, Kenya
15 Mar 193248.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzippari
19 Jun 193248.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzippari
7 Jun 194561.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Zanzibar, Kenya
20 Mar 196682.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanzibar, Kenya

MicroData Summary for John William Heffernan
Bishop John William Heffernan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nairobi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmanikan, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Ordained BishopBlackrock College, Blackrock
Death PlaceKimmage Manor, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 37
  • mn: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast