Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Joseph Brosnahan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1905Born
16 Jun 192924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
11 Dec 195247.6AppointedBishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
7 Mar 195347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
11 Nov 197065.6AppointedArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
4 Sep 198075.4RetiredArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
26 Jan 199690.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Brosnahan
Archbishop Thomas Joseph Brosnahan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Freetown and Bo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhitegate, Ireland
Ordained BishopChapelle du College, Blackrock

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 748

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast