Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
8 Jun 1973 | Born | ||
21 Sep 2003 | 30.2 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Saint-Denis, France |
27 Jun 2004 | 31.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Saint-Denis, France |
3 Apr 2023 | 49.8 | Appointed | Bishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles |
9 Jul 2023 | 50.0 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles |
(WikiData: Q117201694)
Bishop
Philippe
Guiougou
(born )
Bishop
of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre)
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Baie Mahault aux Abymes, Diocese of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe |
Ordained Deacon | Saint-Étienne, Church, Noisy-le-Sec, Diocese of Saint-Denis, France |
Ordained Priest | Saint-Denis, Cathedral Basilica, Saint-Denis, Diocese of Saint-Denis, France |
Ordained Bishop | Vélodrome de Gourdeliane, Baie-Mahault, Diocese of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠