Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Zenon Cardinal Grocholewski

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

Cardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1939Born
27 May 196222.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poznań, Poland
27 May 196323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
21 Dec 198243.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Acropolis
21 Dec 198243.1AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
6 Jan 198343.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acropolis
16 Dec 199152.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Acropolis
5 Oct 199858.9AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
15 Nov 199960.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
21 Feb 200161.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
21 Feb 200161.3Elevated to Cardinal
12 May 200161.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
2 Apr 200565.4CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
21 Apr 200565.5ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
21 Feb 201171.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
28 Feb 201373.3CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
16 Mar 201373.4ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
31 Mar 2015³75.4RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
17 Jul 202080.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zenon Grocholewski (VIAF: 72887528)
Zenon Cardinal Grocholewski (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBródki, Archdiocese of Poznań, Poland
Ordained DeaconSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań, Poland
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań, Poland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Sts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań, Poland

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2011
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2015
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 2001
  • d: CB, 17 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Sep 2020

Quantcast