Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Fortunato de Gouveia

Bishop Emeritus of Oudtshoorn, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1951 Born
11 Jan 197624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
28 May 201058.9AppointedBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa
17 Jul 201059.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa
2 Jul 201867.0ResignedBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Francisco Fortunato de Gouveia
Bishop Francisco Fortunato de Gouveia (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Oudtshoorn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCape Town, Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}
Ordained BishopDe Jager Sports Complex, Oudtshoorn, Diocese of Oudtshoorn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oudtshoorn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,761
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast