Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Gómez Sierra

Bishop of Huelva, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1957 Born
18 Sep 198224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Spain
18 Dec 201053.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
18 Dec 201053.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vergi
26 Feb 201153.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vergi
15 Jun 202062.5AppointedBishop of Huelva, Spain
25 Jul 202062.6InstalledBishop of Huelva, Spain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Gómez Sierra
Bishop Santiago Gómez Sierra (born ) Bishop of Huelva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadridejos, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huelva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,959
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2020
  • i: CB, 18 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast