Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dodė Gjergji

Bishop of Prizren-Prishtina, Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1963 Born
15 Aug 198926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Skopje-Prizren, North Macedonia
5 Feb 200037.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sapė, Albania
23 Nov 200542.8AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
5 Jan 200642.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sapė, Albania
12 Dec 200643.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Prizren, Serbia
5 Sep 201855.6AppointedBishop of Prizren-Prishtina, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Dodė Gjergji (VIAF: 1587150748995316420004)
Bishop Dodė Gjergji (born ) Bishop of Prizren-Prishtina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStublla, Yugoslavia
Ordained BishopNene Tereza, Cathedral, Vau-Dejes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prizren-Prishtina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,024
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Mar 2021

Quantcast