Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Giulietti

Archbishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1964 Born
28 Oct 199026.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
29 Sep 199127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
30 May 201450.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
30 May 201450.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Termae Himerae
10 Aug 201450.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Termae Himerae
19 Jan 201955.0AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
12 May 201955.3InstalledArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giulietti (VIAF: 305398444)
Archbishop Paolo Giulietti (born ) Archbishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Archdiocese of Perugia
Ordained DeaconSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Perugia, Archdiocese of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve
Ordained PriestSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Perugia, Archdiocese of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Perugia, Archdiocese of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lucca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 May 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,263
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2019
  • i: CB, 26 Jan 2019
  • loc: AM, 10 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast