Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Miguel Gil Eisner

Deceased

Bishop of Salto, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1953Born
25 Mar 198329.8Ordained PriestPriest of Morón, Argentina
13 May 199744.0IncardinatedPriest of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina
24 Jul 201865.2AppointedBishop of Salto, Uruguay
23 Sep 201865.3Ordained BishopBishop of Salto, Uruguay
17 Jan 202066.6DiedBishop of Salto, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Fernando Miguel Gil Eisner
Bishop Fernando Miguel Gil Eisner (born , died ) Bishop of Salto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopSan Juan Bautista, Cathedral, Salto, Diocese of Salto
Death PlaceSalto, Diocese of Salto
Buried Place (Original)Cementerio Central, Cemetery, Salto, Diocese of Salto

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Aug 2018
  • c34: CB, 22 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,854
  • d: CB, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast