Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Ghirelli

Bishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1944 Born
29 Jun 196924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Modigliana, Italy
Mar 198338.5IncardinatedPriest of Bologna, Italy
18 Oct 200258.2AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
30 Nov 200258.3Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
15 Dec 200258.3InstalledBishop of Imola, Italy
31 May 201974.8RetiredBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Ghirelli
Bishop Tommaso Ghirelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlì, Diocese of Forli
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Cathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Imola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,285
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast