Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Cavina

Bishop Emeritus of Carpi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1955 Born
15 May 198025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Imola, Italy
14 Nov 201156.7AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
22 Jan 201256.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
5 Feb 201256.9InstalledBishop of Carpi, Italy
26 Jun 201964.3ResignedBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cavina
Bishop Francesco Cavina (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Carpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza
Ordained BishopSan Cassiano, Cathedral Basilica, Imola, Diocese of Imola

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carpi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Nov 2011
  • i: CB, 1 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,247
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast