Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Argimiro Alvaro García Rodríguez, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tucupita, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Coropissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1905Born
14 Jun 193024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Dec 195550.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tucupita, Venezuela
19 Dec 195550.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Coropissus
8 Jul 195650.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coropissus
25 Nov 198580.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tucupita, Venezuela
16 Dec 199186.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tucupita, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Argimiro Alvaro García Rodríguez
Bishop Argimiro Alvaro García Rodríguez O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tucupita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEspinosa, Spain

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast