Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Percy Lorenzo Galvan Flores

Archbishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1965 Born
18 Jul 199125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sucre, Bolivia
2 Feb 201347.4AppointedPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia
1 May 201347.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia
4 May 201347.7InstalledPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia
23 May 202054.7AppointedArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
1 Sep 202055.0InstalledArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Percy Lorenzo Galvan Flores
Archbishop Percy Lorenzo Galvan Flores (born ) Archbishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTomás Frías
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sucre, Archdiocese of Sucre

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of La Paz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 2 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,779
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast