Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bali Gali

Bishop Emeritus of Guntur, India

Apostolic Administrator of Cuddapah


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1939 Born
19 Dec 196425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guntur, India
2 Jul 198445.1AppointedBishop of Guntur, India
23 Oct 198445.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guntur, India
25 Jun 201677.1RetiredBishop of Guntur, India
10 Dec 201879.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cuddapah, India

MicroData Summary for Bali Gali
Bishop Bali Gali (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Guntur

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatibandla
Ordained BishopMary Help of Christians, Cathedral, Guntur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guntur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2016
  • aadm: CB, 10 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 29 Dec 2020

Quantcast