Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gutemberg Freire Régis, C.SS.R.

Prelate Emeritus of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1940 Born
2 Feb 196120.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Jun 196625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Oct 197434.1AppointedPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
5 May 197837.7AppointedPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
23 Jul 197837.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
28 Feb 200766.5ResignedPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gutemberg Freire Régis
Bishop Gutemberg Freire Régis C.SS.R. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Coari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLago do Anamă
Ordained BishopCoari, Territorial Prelature of Coari, Amazonas

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Coari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Jun 2021

Quantcast