Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evangelista Alcimar Caldas Magalhães, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1940Born
9 Jul 196727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Sep 198141.5AppointedBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
25 Oct 198141.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
12 Sep 199050.6AppointedPrelate of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
14 Aug 199151.5AppointedBishop of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
20 May 201575.2RetiredBishop of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
20 Jun 202181.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Evangelista Alcimar Caldas Magalhães
Bishop Evangelista Alcimar Caldas Magalhães O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alto Solimões

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenjamin Constant
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida, Manaus, Archdiocese of Manaus, Amazonas
Death PlaceManaus, Archdiocese of Manaus, Amazonas

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,674
  • d: CB, 20 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Jun 2021

Quantcast