Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphael Michael Fliss

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Superior, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1930Born
26 May 195625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
5 Nov 197949.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
20 Dec 197949.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
27 Jun 198554.6SucceededBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
28 Jun 200776.6RetiredBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
21 Sep 201584.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Superior, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Raphael Michael Fliss
Bishop Raphael Michael Fliss (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Superior

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee
Ordained BishopSuperior, Diocese of Superior, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2007
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast