Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Settimio Arturo Ferrazzetta, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1924Born
1 Jul 195126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Mar 197752.2AppointedBishop of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau
19 Jun 197752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau
27 Jan 199974.1DiedBishop of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau

MicroData Summary for Settimio Arturo Ferrazzetta
Bishop Settimio Arturo Ferrazzetta O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bissau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelva di Progno
Ordained BishopBissau, Diocese of Bissau

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast