Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Doroteo Fernández y Fernández

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1913Born
13 Mar 193724.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 195642.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santander, Spain
6 Mar 195642.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Castabala
3 Jun 195643.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castabala
19 Feb 196248.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Badajoz, Spain
22 Jul 197158.3SucceededBishop of Badajoz, Spain
15 Jan 197965.8ResignedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
10 Jul 198976.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Doroteo Fernández y Fernández
Bishop Doroteo Fernández y Fernández (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuelde

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast