Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lizardo Estrada Herrera, O.S.A.

Auxiliary Bishop of Cuzco, Peru

Titular Bishop of Ausuccura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1973 Born
16 May 199824.6First VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
27 May 200127.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
7 Aug 200531.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
9 Jan 202147.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuzco, Peru
9 Jan 202147.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
24 Feb 202147.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura

MicroData Summary for Lizardo Estrada Herrera
Bishop Lizardo Estrada Herrera O.S.A. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotabambas, Archdiocese of Cuzco
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Cuzco, Archdiocese of Cuzco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cuzco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast