Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ugwu Eneja

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Enugu, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1919Born
29 Jul 195132.5Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
12 Nov 196243.8IncardinatedPriest of Enugu, Nigeria
10 Nov 197758.8AppointedBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
26 Feb 197859.1Ordained BishopBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
8 Nov 199677.8RetiredBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
14 Nov 200889.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Enugu, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Michael Ugwu Eneja
Bishop Michael Ugwu Eneja (born 1919, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Enugu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbagwa-Ani
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Enugu, Diocese of Enugu

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,133
  • opd/inca: CB, 12 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jun 2021

Quantcast