Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernt Ivar (Markus) Eidsvig, C.R.S.A.

Bishop of Oslo, Norway


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1953 Born
20 Jun 198228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oslo, Norway
28 Aug 199642.9Solemn VowsPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
29 Jul 200551.8AppointedBishop of Oslo, Norway
22 Oct 200552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oslo, Norway
8 Jun 200955.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trondheim, Norway
3 Oct 202067.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Trondheim, Norway

MicroData Summary for Bernt Ivar (Markus) Eidsvig (VIAF: 79149066573665601773)
Bishop Bernt Ivar (Markus) Eidsvig C.R.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Oslo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRjukan
Ordained BishopTrefoldighet (Lutheran), Church, Oslo, Diocese of Oslo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oslo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,003

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast