Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Michel Alain di Falco Léandri

Bishop Emeritus of Gap (-Embrun), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1941 Born
29 Jun 196826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
4 Jul 199755.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
4 Jul 199755.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vallis
10 Oct 199755.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vallis
2 Sep 200361.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gap, France
18 Nov 200361.9AppointedBishop of Gap, France
8 Apr 201775.3RetiredBishop of Gap (-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Michel Alain di Falco Léandri (VIAF: 107516789)
Bishop Jean-Michel Alain di Falco Léandri (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gap (-Embrun)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, Archdiocese of Marseille
Ordained PriestSainte-Marie-Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gap (-Embrun).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,156
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2017
  • c1/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast