Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erminio De Scalzi

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Arbanum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1940 Born
27 Jun 196423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 May 199958.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 May 199958.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arbanum
19 Jun 199958.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arbanum
30 Apr 202079.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Erminio De Scalzi (VIAF: 162496697)
Bishop Erminio De Scalzi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaronno, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSant’Ambrogio, Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,571
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast