Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Paul Delorme, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Titular Bishop of Ottocium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1919Born
11 Oct 194222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
2 Oct 197555.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
2 Oct 197555.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ottocium
16 Nov 197555.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ottocium
3 Dec 199475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
27 Dec 201293.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Maurice Paul Delorme
Bishop Maurice Paul Delorme Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained BishopSaint Jean, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 70.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,081
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast