Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Italo Dell’Oro, C.R.S.

Auxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Sucarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1953 Born
13 Sep 198128.2Solemn VowsMember of Clerks Regular of Somasca
11 Sep 198229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
18 May 202167.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
18 May 202167.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sucarda
2 Jul 202168.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sucarda

MicroData Summary for Italo Dell’Oro
Bishop Italo Dell’Oro C.R.S. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalgrate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestSantissimo Crocifisso, Shrine, Como, Diocese of Como, Italy
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Co-Cathedral, Houston, Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2021
  • c1/loc: AM, 23 May 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 May 2021
  • c34: CB, 2 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast