Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Donald Soens

Bishop Emeritus of Sioux City, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1926 Born
6 May 195023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Davenport, Iowa, USA
15 Jun 198356.8AppointedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
17 Aug 198356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
28 Nov 199872.2ResignedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Donald Soens
Bishop Lawrence Donald Soens (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sioux City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIowa City
Ordained BishopSioux City, Diocese of Sioux City, Iowa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sioux City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast