Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Max Leroy Davis

Bishop Emeritus of Australia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1945 Born
31 Oct 197126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
16 Jul 200357.9AppointedBishop of Australia, Military
22 Aug 200358.0Ordained BishopBishop of Australia, Military
24 May 202175.7RetiredBishop of Australia, Military

MicroData Summary for Max Leroy Davis
Bishop Max Leroy Davis (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Australia, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTownsville
Ordained BishopSaint Christopher, Cathedral, Canberra, Archdiocese of Canberra (and Goulburn)

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Australia, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,443
  • r: Bollettino, 24 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 May 2021

Quantcast