Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Francis Cusack

Deceased

Bishop of Albany, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1862Born
30 May 188523.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
11 Mar 190442.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
11 Mar 190442.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
25 Apr 190442.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
5 Jul 191553.3AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
12 Jul 191856.3DiedBishop of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Cusack (VIAF: 19326208)
Bishop Thomas Francis Cusack (born , died ) Bishop of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 43
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast