Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Robert Crowley

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Maraguia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1915Born
1 May 195338.3Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
16 Jun 197156.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
16 Jun 197156.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Maraguia
24 Aug 197156.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maraguia
8 May 199075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
4 Feb 200388.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Robert Crowley
Bishop Joseph Robert Crowley (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFort Wayne, Diocese of Fort Wayne, Indiana
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Fort Wayne, Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 809
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 99, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 6 Jan 2021

Quantcast