Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Stagg Coakley

Archbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1955 Born
8 Apr 198226.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wichita, Kansas, USA
21 May 198327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
21 Oct 200449.3AppointedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
28 Dec 200449.5Ordained BishopBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
16 Dec 201055.5AppointedArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
11 Feb 201155.6InstalledArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Stagg Coakley
Archbishop Paul Stagg Coakley (born ) Archbishop of Oklahoma City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorfolk, VA, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia
Ordained DeaconImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Wichita, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Wichita, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Salina, Diocese of Salina, Kansas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Oklahoma City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,730
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2010
  • loc: CB, 25 Oct 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 3 Nov 2022