Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octavio Cisneros

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Eanach Dúin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1945 Born
29 May 197125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Jun 200660.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Jun 200660.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Eanach Dúin
22 Aug 200661.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eanach Dúin
30 Oct 202075.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Octavio Cisneros
Bishop Octavio Cisneros (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Habana, Cuba
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Angels, Church, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brooklyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,224
  • c1: CB, 11 May 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast