Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Chamniern Santisukniram

Archbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1942 Born
17 May 197027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
5 Nov 199856.0AppointedBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
23 Jan 199956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
1 Jul 200562.6AppointedArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
20 Aug 200562.8InstalledArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand
13 May 202077.5RetiredArchbishop of Thare and Nonseng, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Louis Chamniern Santisukniram
Archbishop Louis Chamniern Santisukniram (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Thare and Nonseng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNonseng
Ordained BishopSaint Ann, Cathedral, Nakhon Sawan, Diocese of Nakhon Sawan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,466
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast